Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 624 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6987 Week
» 9569 Month
» 274202 Year
» 1495767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2790 m/e 03/1930
LNER (1946) 8973 m/e 04/1946
BR 68973 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 318
Works Number 1734
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1930
Withdrawal Tue 21/07/1959
Service Life 29 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1930
FRO Frodingham 01/01/1948
36A Doncaster 4w/e 25/07/1953
36C Frodingham 5w/e 24/07/1954
36A Doncaster w/e 31/01/1959
   Withdrawn 21/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham 29/12/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   21/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2790
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1734
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8973    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Frodingham (FRO)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68973    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
21/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68973    

prev prev