Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2791 m/e 03/1930
LNER (1946) 8974 m/e 04/1946
BR 68974 m/e 04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 318
Works Number 1735
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1930
Withdrawal Mon 03/08/1959
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36C Frodingham 4w/e 21/10/1950
36A Doncaster 4w/e 25/07/1953
38A Colwick 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn 03/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 16/10/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 22/02/1958
WDN   03/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2791
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1735
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8974    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
04/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 68974    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68974    

prev prev