Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 90 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1327 Week
» 3909 Month
» 268542 Year
» 1490107 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2792 m/e 04/1930
LNER (1946) 8975 m/e 04/1946
BR 68975 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 318
Works Number 1737
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1930
Withdrawal Sat 29/07/1961
Service Life 31 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1930
ANN Annesley 01/01/1948
34B Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952
38B Annesley 4w/e 13/12/1952
34B Hornsey 4w/e 20/06/1953
38B Annesley 4w/e 25/07/1953
38A Colwick 3w/e 12/11/1955
34A Kings Cross w/e 15/07/1961
   Withdrawn 29/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 05/11/1955
WDN   29/07/1961
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 05/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2792
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1737
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8975    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68975    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
29/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68975    

prev prev