Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4245 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17651 Week
» 70667 Month
» 190194 Year
» 3217047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2792 |
m/e |
04/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8975 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68975 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
318 |
Works Number |
1737 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/07/1961 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2792 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1737 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8975 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68975 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68975 |
|
|