Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 97 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1131 Week
» 23637 Month
» 326827 Year
» 1548392 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2793 m/e 04/1930
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8976 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 68976 m/e 04/1949
Departmental 16 m/e 09/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 318
Works Number 1739
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1930
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Service Life 32 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1930
ANN Annesley on 01/01/1948
34B Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952
38B Annesley 4w/e 13/12/1952
34E New England w/e 20/12/1958
34B Hornsey w/e 30/01/1960
34E New England w/e 15/07/1961
36A Doncaster w/e 09/06/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 29/11/1952
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
LOAN 34E New England 4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 6w/e 09/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2793
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1739
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8976    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68976    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
09/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 16    
09/1962 Renumbered Renumbered to 16    

prev prev