|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Works Shunters) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2794 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1740 |
||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8977 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68977 | ||
18/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
19/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
09/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
12/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
26/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
29/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68977 |