Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 568 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6377 Week
» 13561 Month
» 321542 Year
» 1205923 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 602 m/e 12/1938
LNER (1946) 8980 m/e 06/1946
BR 68980 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1938
Withdrawal Mon 22/02/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36C Frodingham 4w/e 20/06/1953
36A Doncaster 4w/e 25/05/1956
34B Hornsey 5w/e 15/11/1958
   Withdrawn 22/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   22/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 602
Built at Gorton Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8980    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68980    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68980    

prev prev