|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 605 Built at Gorton Works |
||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8981 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68981 | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
20/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) | ||
15/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) | ||
19/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68981 |