Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 771 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14177 Week
» 67193 Month
» 186720 Year
» 3213573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
606 |
m/e |
12/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8982 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68982 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
on |
13/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
04/11/1961 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
2w/e |
23/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 606 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8982 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68982 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68982 |
|
|