Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 584   04/1939
LNER (1946) 8986   06/1946
BR 68986   08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 04/1939
Withdrawal Mon 02/07/1962
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34B Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952
36A Doncaster w/e 15/07/1961
   Withdrawn 02/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   02/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 584
Built at Gorton Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8986    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON)    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68986    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
02/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 68986    

prev prev