Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 61 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 61 Week
» 18382 Month
» 106574 Year
» 990955 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 585   05/1939
LNER (1946) 8987   17/03/1946
BR 68987   11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 05/1939
Withdrawal Tue 24/04/1962
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34B Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952
36A Doncaster w/e 15/07/1961
   Withdrawn 24/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   24/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 585
Built at Gorton Works
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8987    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68987    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
24/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 68987    

prev prev