Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 36 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5468 Week
» 17289 Month
» 186061 Year
» 1070442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 595 m/e 07/1939
LNER (1946) 8990 m/e 04/1946
BR 68990 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 07/1939
Withdrawal Fri 21/04/1961
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Darnall 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34B Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952
   Withdrawn 21/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   21/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 595
Built at Gorton Works
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8990    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68990    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68990    

prev prev