Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19638 Week
» 72654 Month
» 192181 Year
» 3219034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1205 |
m/e |
09/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4205 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8809 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68809 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
739 |
To Service |
During 09/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 11/09/1956 |
Service Life |
59 yrs , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/09/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1205 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 739 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4205 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8809 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68809 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
11/09/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68809 |
|
|