Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 114 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17917 Week
» 70933 Month
» 190460 Year
» 3217313 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1216 |
m/e |
12/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4216 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8815 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68815 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
35B |
Grantham |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
26/05/1956 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1216 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2921 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4216 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8815 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68815 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
15/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68815 |
|
|