Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 80 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17883 Week
» 70899 Month
» 190426 Year
» 3217279 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1226 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4226 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8825 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
68825 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4471 |
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 10/08/1953 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/08/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1226 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4471 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4226 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8825 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68825 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
10/08/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68825 |
|
|