Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2156 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19959 Week
» 72975 Month
» 192502 Year
» 3219355 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1227 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4227 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8826 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68826 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4472 |
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/03/1957 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/03/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1227 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4472 |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4227 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8826 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68826 |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
11/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68826 |
|
|