Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1230 m/e 04/1899
LNER (1924) 4230 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 8829 m/e 12/1946
BR 68829 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer P. Stirling
Class J52
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4475
To Service During 04/1899
Withdrawal Mon 10/02/1958
Service Life 58 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HSY Hornsey 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 25/08/1956
   Withdrawn 10/02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 18/08/1956
WDN   10/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1899 To Service To service as GNR Number 1230
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4475
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4230    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8829    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68829    
25/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 68829    

prev prev