Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1909 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15315 Week
» 68331 Month
» 187858 Year
» 3214711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1232 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4232 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8831 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68831 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4477 |
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/01/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1232 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4477 |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4232 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8831 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68831 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
20/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68831 |
|
|