Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 756 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14162 Week
» 67178 Month
» 186705 Year
» 3213558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1234 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4234 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8833 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68833 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4479 |
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/02/1956 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/02/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1234 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4479 |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4234 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8833 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68833 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
20/02/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68833 |
|
|