Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1382 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19185 Week
» 72201 Month
» 191728 Year
» 3218581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1247 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4247 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8846 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68846 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4492 |
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 08/05/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/05/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/10/1958 |
E.R. locomotive news |
C12 67352 is now acting as Station pilot, Grantham and is ex-works, fully lined out; J52 68846 is ex-works, fully lined out at Hornsey; L.T.S.R. 4-4-2T 41969 is ex-works in unlined black at Plaistow; 61632, Belvoir Castle has been renamed Royal Sovereign and was ex-Stratford mid-October whilst 61671 was still in scrap yard with nameplates Royal Sovereign. |
SLS/195811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1247 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4492 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4247 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8846 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68846 |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
08/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68846 |
|
|