Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 205 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6412 Week
» 3925 Month
» 231809 Year
» 1453374 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1253 m/e 12/1901
LNER (1924) 4253 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 8852 m/e 10/1946
BR 68852 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer P. Stirling
Class J52
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 227
Works Number 946
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1901
NWE New England 01/01/1948
38A Colwick 4w/e 22/01/1955
   Withdrawn 31/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 29/01/1955
WDN   31/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1253
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 946
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4253    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8852    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68852    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
31/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 68852    

prev prev