Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 359 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18162 Week
» 71178 Month
» 190705 Year
» 3217558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1268 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4268 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8867 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68867 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
227 |
Works Number |
961 |
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/02/1958 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/02/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1268 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 961 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4268 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8867 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68867 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68867 |
|
|