Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 192 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 23823 Week
» 88777 Month
» 291441 Year
» 3318294 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1274 |
m/e |
10/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4274 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8873 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68873 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
242 |
Works Number |
1090 |
To Service |
During 10/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/09/1955 |
Service Life |
50 yrs |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
w/e |
01/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1274 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1090 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4274 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8873 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68873 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
30/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68873 |
|
|