Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 584 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4132 Week
» 5022 Month
» 313003 Year
» 1197384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1281 m/e 12/1908
LNER (1924) 4281 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 8880 m/e 12/1946
BR 68880 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer P. Stirling
Class J52
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 257
Works Number 1216
To Service During 12/1908
Withdrawal Fri 17/08/1956
Service Life 47 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 21/08/1954
   Withdrawn 17/08/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 11/09/1954
WDN   17/08/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1908 To Service To service as GNR Number 1281
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1216
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4281    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8880    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68880    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 68880    

prev prev