Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2911 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16317 Week
» 69333 Month
» 188860 Year
» 3215713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1287 |
m/e |
02/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4287 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8886 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68886 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
257 |
Works Number |
1222 |
To Service |
During 02/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/11/1957 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1287 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1222 |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4287 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8886 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68886 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
25/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68886 |
|
|