Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1340 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14746 Week
» 67762 Month
» 187289 Year
» 3214142 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
972 |
m/e |
09/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3972 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8774 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68774 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
658 |
To Service |
During 09/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/07/1953 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/07/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 972 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 658 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3972 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8774 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68774 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68774 |
|
|