Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15033 Week
» 68049 Month
» 187576 Year
» 3214429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1046 |
m/e |
07/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4046 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8783 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68783 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5017 |
To Service |
During 07/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/10/1955 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1046 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5017 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4046 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8783 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68783 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
03/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68783 |
|
|