|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1896 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1049 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5020 |
||
01/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4049 | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8786 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) | ||
10/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68786 | ||
20/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
23/11/1953 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68786 |