Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2186 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 16229 Week
» 81183 Month
» 283847 Year
» 3310700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1050 |
m/e |
07/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4050 |
m/e |
02/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8787 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68787 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5021 |
To Service |
During 07/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 19/10/1955 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1896 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
18/10/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1050 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5021 |
|
|
02/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4050 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8787 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68787 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68787 |
|
|