Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3431 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16837 Week
» 69853 Month
» 189380 Year
» 3216233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1058 |
m/e |
07/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4058 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8795 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68795 |
m/e |
02/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5029 |
To Service |
During 07/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 23/11/1955 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1896 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
15/11/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1058 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5029 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4058 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8795 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
02/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68795 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
23/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68795 |
|
|