Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 856 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4404 Week
» 5294 Month
» 313275 Year
» 1197656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1211 m/e 06/1897
LNER (1924) 4211 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 8798 m/e 09/1946
BR 68798 w/e 18/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer P. Stirling
Class J52
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J5306/1897
J52/106/1932
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5095
To Service During 06/1897
Withdrawal w/e Mon 08/11/1954
Service Life 57 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
35B Grantham 4w/e 23/12/1950
36C Frodingham 4w/e 13/12/1952
38A Colwick 4w/e 20/06/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 08/11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35B Grantham m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   w/e 08/11/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1897 To Service To service as GNR Number 1211
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5095
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4211    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8798    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68798    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 68798    

prev prev