Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 870 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6679 Week
» 13863 Month
» 321844 Year
» 1206225 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 250 m/e 03/1893
LNER (1924) 7250 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 8214 m/e 06/1946
BR 68214 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J65
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B32
To Service During 03/1893
Withdrawal Mon 22/10/1956
Scrapping During y/e 1957
Service Life 63 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32G Melton Constable 4w/e 13/11/1954
32F Yarmouth Beach 6w/e 25/12/1954
   Withdrawn 22/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IIM   m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC MEL   w/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC 32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 01/01/1955
WDN   22/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1925 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1893 To Service To service as GER Number 250
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7250    
09/1925 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8214    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68214    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F)    
10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 68214    

prev prev