Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4394 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17800 Week
» 70816 Month
» 190343 Year
» 3217196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
293 |
m/e |
05/1887 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7293 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8374 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68374 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J66 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
K19 |
To Service |
During 05/1887 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/06/1954 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1887 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38D |
|
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
22/08/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/06/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1887 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 293 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7293 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8374 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68374 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
14/06/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68374 |
|
|