Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18880 Week
» 71896 Month
» 191423 Year
» 3218276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
319 |
m/e |
11/1888 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7319 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8383 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68383 |
w/e |
10/11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J66 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T21 |
To Service |
During 11/1888 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/10/1955 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1888 |
MAR |
|
March |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38D |
|
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
22/08/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38D |
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1888 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 319 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7319 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8383 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68383 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
17/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68383 |
|
|