Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3077 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16483 Week
» 69499 Month
» 189026 Year
» 3215879 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
324 |
m/e |
12/1888 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7324 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8388 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68388 |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J66 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T21 |
To Service |
During 12/1888 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/04/1952 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1888 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 324 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7324 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8388 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68388 |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
28/04/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68388 |
|
|