Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 965 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14371 Week
» 67387 Month
» 186914 Year
» 3213767 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
328 |
m/e |
03/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7328 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8491 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68491 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R24 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 03/06/1958 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
ALLOC |
35B |
Grantham |
4w/e |
28/04/1956 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
26/05/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1935 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 328 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7328 |
|
|
05/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (BOS) |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8491 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68491 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
03/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68491 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|