Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17918 Week
» 70934 Month
» 190461 Year
» 3217314 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
329 |
m/e |
03/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7329 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8492 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68492 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R24 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Fri 22/06/1956 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1890 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/06/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/06/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/07/1952 |
St Rollox Works |
On (5/7) No. 90774 (the last 2-10-0 built) came out of works minus nameplates. (Formerly named North British). No. 68492 which had tender tank, is in shops to have the tender removed now that Lauder job is finished. Frequently St. Rollox Works has to clear its floor at weekends, and un-numbered 0-6-0 and 0-4-4T types go to Balornock depot where they are painted on Monday. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 329 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7329 |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8492 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68492 |
|
|
22/06/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68492 |
|
|
08/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|