Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
332 |
m/e |
04/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7332 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8495 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68495 |
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R24 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 07/05/1958 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1890 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31C |
|
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
22/08/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/05/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STV |
Staveley (G.C.) |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
ANN |
Annesley |
m/e |
28/02/1946 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 332 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7332 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8495 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68495 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
07/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68495 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|