Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4296 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17702 Week
» 70718 Month
» 190245 Year
» 3217098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
334 |
m/e |
04/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7334 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8496 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68496 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R24 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 14/05/1956 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 334 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7334 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8496 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68496 |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68496 |
|
|