|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
21/11/1960 | G.E. Dieselisation | Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. | SLS/196101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1890 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 337 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7337 | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8499 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68499 | ||
24/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
03/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
22/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
23/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
22/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
10/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) | ||
16/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
26/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
06/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68499 |