Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 697 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14103 Week
» 67119 Month
» 186646 Year
» 3213499 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
345 |
m/e |
05/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7345 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8507 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68507 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S24 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/06/1960 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1890 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35A |
|
New England |
5w/e |
22/10/1955 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
5w/e |
17/12/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/06/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
07/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1930 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
02/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1930 |
Condensers removed |
02/1930 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 345 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7345 |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8507 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68507 |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68507 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|