Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1462 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19265 Week
» 72281 Month
» 191808 Year
» 3218661 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
346 |
m/e |
05/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7346 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8508 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68508 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S24 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/02/1961 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1930 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
02/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1930 |
Condensers removed |
02/1930 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 346 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7346 |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8508 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68508 |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68508 |
|
|