Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 995 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18798 Week
» 71814 Month
» 191341 Year
» 3218194 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
398 |
m/e |
11/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7398 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8510 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68510 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A26 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/09/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1890 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
STR |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
40A |
|
Lincoln |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/09/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 398 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7398 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8510 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68510 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
28/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68510 |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|