Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3819 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17225 Week
» 70241 Month
» 189768 Year
» 3216621 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
411 |
m/e |
01/1891 |
Great Eastern Railway (2nd) |
15 |
m/e |
01/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7015 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8520 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
68520 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B26 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/08/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 411 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1920 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7015 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8520 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68520 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
17/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68520 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|