Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1964 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15370 Week
» 68386 Month
» 187913 Year
» 3214766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
353 |
m/e |
03/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7353 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8530 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68530 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P29 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 14/02/1961 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1928 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1928 |
Condensers removed |
11/1928 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1935 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 353 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7353 |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
08/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8530 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
08/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
21/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68530 |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
14/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68530 |
|
|