Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2064 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15470 Week
» 68486 Month
» 188013 Year
» 3214866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
361 |
m/e |
04/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7361 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8538 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68538 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R29 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1892 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/09/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1946 |
General |
An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains |
SLS/194701 |
30/04/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works Yard) |
New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 361 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7361 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8538 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68538 |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68538 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|