|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/05/1947 | Haymarket MPD | Class 'C7' No. 2970 was 'out of service' here both on 3/5 and 10/5. L.M.S. '8F' No. 8551 was on shed on 3/5. | SLS/194708 |
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1894 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 375 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7375 | ||
01/1928 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
01/1928 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8551 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) | ||
07/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68551 | ||
07/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yoker (65G) | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yoker (65G) | ||
17/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
21/06/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68551 | ||
07/1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped |