Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1186 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14592 Week
» 67608 Month
» 187135 Year
» 3213988 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
376 |
m/e |
06/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7376 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8552 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68552 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
N33 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
1939 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 376 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7376 |
|
|
03/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8552 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68552 |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
17/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68552 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|