Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1158 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18961 Week
» 71977 Month
» 191504 Year
» 3218357 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
377 |
m/e |
10/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7377 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8553 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
68553 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/12/1958 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1895 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
6E |
|
Wrexham Rhosddu |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
6F |
|
Bidston |
w/e |
01/11/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1926 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
08/1926 |
Condensers removed |
08/1926 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 377 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7377 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8553 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68553 |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bidston (6F) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68553 |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|