Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14161 Week
» 67177 Month
» 186704 Year
» 3213557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
380 |
m/e |
10/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7380 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8556 |
on |
09/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68556 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1930 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
01/1930 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1930 |
Condensers removed |
01/1930 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 380 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7380 |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8556 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68556 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
14/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
24/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68556 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|